EP0355921 - Shell and tube heat pipe condenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stirling Thermal Motors Inc. 2841 Boardwalk Ann Arbor Michigan 48104 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states Stirling Thermal Motors Inc. 2841 Boardwalk Ann Arbor Michigan 48104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meijer, Roelf Jan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Verhey, Robert c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1991/20] | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, Ir. Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1990/09] | Melio, Jan Dirk INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89202107.2 | 17.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880233732 | 19.08.1988 Original published format: US 233732 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355921 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355921 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355921 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02G1/057, F28D15/02 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
F02G1/055 (EP,US);
F02G2254/20 (EP,US);
F02G2254/30 (EP,US);
F02G2255/00 (EP,US);
Y10S165/913 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Gehäuse und Rohr für einen Wärmerohr-Kondensator | [1990/09] | English: | Shell and tube heat pipe condenser | [1990/09] | French: | Enveloppe et tube de condensateur de caloduc | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 16.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.02.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.07.1994 | IT | 06.07.1994 | SE | 06.10.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 06.07.1994 | |
IT | 06.07.1994 | ||
SE | 06.10.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 06.07.1994 | |
SE | 06.10.1994 | ||
FR | 02.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 06.10.1994 | |
FR | 02.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/28] | FR | 02.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4785633 (MEIJER ROELF J [US], et al); | [A]GB2172697 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]US3731660 (LEFFERT C) |