EP0360312 - Branching connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRAKA POLVA B.V. Vlaardingenlaan 11 NL-1062 HM Amsterdam / NL | [1990/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ten Kroode, Paulus A.N. Ferdinand Bolstraat 147-1 NL-1072 LH Amsterdam / NL | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Bouchoms, Maurice, et al Solvay Département de la Propriété Industrielle, 310, rue de Ransbeek B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Bouchoms, Maurice, et al Solvay Département de la Propriété Industrielle, 310, rue de Ransbeek B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 89202149.4 | 25.08.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | FR19880011777 | 07.09.1988 Original published format: FR 8811777 | [1990/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0360312 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/00 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
F16L47/345 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1990/13] | Title | German: | Abzweigverbindung | [1990/13] | English: | Branching connection | [1990/13] | French: | Raccord de dérivation | [1990/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 17.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/02] | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3554217 ; | [A]FR2381230 ; | [A]FR2610695 ; | [AD]FR2285567 ; | [A]CH416236 |