EP0358270 - Method and electrical system for recording and processing time-related data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIAL CONTROL SYSTEMS B.V. Houtschelf 1 NL-3371 KB Hardinxveld-Giessendam / NL | [1990/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Doesburg, Evert Jantje Espendreef 14 NL-4254 BT Sleewijk / NL | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 89202225.2 | 01.09.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | NL19880002199 | 06.09.1988 Original published format: NL 8802199 | [1990/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358270 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358270 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/10 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
G07C5/0858 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und elektrisches System zum Aufnehmen und Verarbeiten von zeitbezogenen Daten | [1990/11] | English: | Method and electrical system for recording and processing time-related data | [1990/11] | French: | Méthode et système électrique pour enregistrer et pour traiter des données en relation avec le temps | [1990/11] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 09.02.1994 | GR | 09.02.1994 | IT | 09.02.1994 | LI | 09.02.1994 | SE | 09.02.1994 | AT | 01.09.1994 | ES | 02.09.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/37] | CH | 09.02.1994 | |
GR | 09.02.1994 | ||
IT | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
AT | 01.09.1994 | ||
ES | 02.09.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | CH | 09.02.1994 | |
GR | 09.02.1994 | ||
IT | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
AT | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 09.02.1994 | |
IT | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
AT | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1996/14] | CH | 09.02.1994 | |
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
AT | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1994/47] | CH | 09.02.1994 | |
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 09.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58148912 ; | [AD]US3922649 (THOME RICHARD J); | [A]US4338512 (LUDWIG WALTER F); | [YD]DE3221398 (KIENZLE APPARATE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3223313 (ROTH JOHANN); | [A]GB2141856 (YEOMAN ELECTRONICS LIMITED); | [Y]EP0142013 (MARTE GERHARD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 266 (P-239)[1411], 26th November 1983; & JP-A-58 148 912 (NITSUTSUU SOUGOU KENKYUSHO K.K.) 05-09-1983, & JP58148912 A 00000000 |