EP0361586 - Device for automatically controlling food preparation in a microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] | Applicant(s) | For:ES
IRE INDUSTRIE RIUNITE EURODOMESTICI S.R.L. 27, Viale Guido Borghi I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | For:DE
FR
GB
SE
WHIRLPOOL EUROPE B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For:ES
IRE INDUSTRIE RIUNITE EURODOMESTICI S.R.L. 27, Viale Guido Borghi I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
SE
WHIRLPOOL EUROPE B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 NL-5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | |||
Former [1990/14] | For:ES
IRE INDUSTRIE RIUNITE EURODOMESTICI S.R.L. 27, Viale Guido Borghi I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
SE
WHIRLPOOL INTERNATIONAL B.V. Tarwelaan 58 NL-5632 KG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kokkeler, Franciscus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Cigarini, Enzo c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Fioroli, Mario c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Montanari, Carlo c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Melio, Jan Dirk Whirlpool Italia S.r.l., Viale Guido Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Melio, Jan Dirk Whirlpool Italia S.r.l., Viale Guido Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | ||
Former [1990/14] | Bos, Kornelis Sjoerd INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89202345.8 | 18.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | IT19880021915U | 23.09.1988 Original published format: IT 2191588 U | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361586 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361586 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/80, H05B6/68 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
H05B6/6452 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Gerät zur automatischen Kontrolle der Lebensmittelzubereitung in einem Mikrowellenofen | [1990/14] | English: | Device for automatically controlling food preparation in a microwave oven | [1990/14] | French: | Dispositif pour contrôler automatiquement la préparation d'aliments dans un four à micro-ondes | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 01.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/40] | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.04.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   06.05.1992 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2362340 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US4125752 (WEGENER CARL J); | [A]FR2562662 (VALEO [FR]); | [XP]EP0313141 (ELECTRONIQUE & PHYSIQUE [FR], et al); | [A]US4341937 (STAATS JAMES E); | [A]EP0031589 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4309584 (TERAKAMI YUKIO); | [A]US4122322 (OHKUBO MASARU, et al); | [A]US3987267 (MOORE DONALD G) |