EP0367316 - Picture signal processing circuit for improving high-frequency picture resolution upon picture signal display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kemner, Rudolf c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Stouten, Johannes Jacobus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1990/19] | van Gils, Cornelis Johannes Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89202434.0 | 28.09.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | NL19880002426 | 04.10.1988 Original published format: NL 8802426 | [1990/19] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0367316 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367316 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/208 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
G06T3/40 (EP,US);
H04N5/208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/19] | Title | German: | Bildsignalbearbeitungsschaltung zur Steigerung der HF-Bildauflösung bei Bildsignalwiedergabe | [1990/19] | English: | Picture signal processing circuit for improving high-frequency picture resolution upon picture signal display | [1990/19] | French: | Circuit de traitement du signal d'image pour améliorer le pouvoir de résolution à haute fréquence lors de la reproduction du signal d'image | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.09.1993 | NL | 08.09.1993 | GB | 08.12.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [1995/03] | NL | 08.09.1993 | |
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
FR | 28.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | NL | 08.09.1993 | |
FR | 28.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 08.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3980819 (SCHWARTZ JAMES W); | [A]US4258298 (HILBURN HUGH C, et al) |