EP0365066 - An air drier tower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldex Aktiebolag Box 501 S-261 24 Landskrona / SE | [1991/51] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states Garphyttan Haldex AB Box 501 S-261 24 Landskrona / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsson, Anders Mikael Birger Sjöbergs Gata 63 S-253 67 Helsingborg / SE | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan c/o SAB NIFE AB Box 515 261 24 Landskrona / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Petri, Stellan c/o SAB NIFE AB Box 515 S-261 24 Landskrona / SE | Application number, filing date | 89202516.4 | 06.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | SE19880003715 | 18.10.1988 Original published format: SE 8803715 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0365066 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0365066 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/26 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
B01D53/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | Lufttrocknungsturm | [1990/17] | English: | An air drier tower | [1990/17] | French: | Tour pour la dessiccation de l'air | [1990/17] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 15.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.01.1993 | NL | 13.01.1993 | SE | 13.01.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [1993/38] | NL | 13.01.1993 | |
SE | 13.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/32] | SE | 13.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1444955 (MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES CO); | [A]DE3413861 (LINDE AG [DE]) |