EP0372625 - Low fat spread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AT | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1990/24] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
FR
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Malcolm Glyn 34 Park Road Stevington Bedfordshire, MK43 7QF / GB | 02 /
Norton, Ian Timothy 29 Croft Way Rushden Northamptonshire, NN10 9EZ / GB | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, Dr., et al UNILEVER N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 89203022.2 | 28.11.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | GB19880028596 | 07.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8828596 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372625 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372625 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372625 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0372625 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/00, A23C15/16 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
A23D7/015 (EP);
A23C15/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Brotaufstrich mit niedrigem Fettgehalt | [1990/24] | English: | Low fat spread | [1990/24] | French: | Produit à tartiner à faible teneur en matières grasses | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 25.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1993
WINNER LIVSMEDEL AB Västra kajen S-374 82 Karlshamn / SE Opponent's representative Wiklund, Ingrid Helena AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1993
WINNER LIVSMEDEL AB Västra kajen S-374 82 Karlshamn / SE Opponent's representative Wiklund, Ingrid Helena AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | 26.11.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.12.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.12.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.09.1994 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.09.1994 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.05.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 20.01.1993 | LI | 20.01.1993 | [2015/21] |
Former [1996/18] | AT | 20.01.1993 | |
CH | 20.01.1993 | ||
LI | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 20.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH436947 (CARTER PROD INC [US]); | [A]GB1094268 (UNILEVER LTD); | [A]GB2035360 (UNILEVER LTD); | [A]EP0098664 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0192284 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [AD]EP0237120 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0279498 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [AD]EP0279499 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [AP]EP0297690 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) |