EP0376379 - Method of manufacturing an optical cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüggendieck, Siegfried Peter Walterscheidstrasse 19 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Koch, Ingo, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Wendenstrasse 35c D-20097 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Koch, Ingo, Dr.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Wendenstrasse 35c D-20097 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89203229.3 | 18.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | DE19883843778 | 24.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3843778 | [1990/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376379 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376379 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G02B6/4405 (EP,US);
G02B6/4479 (EP,US);
G02B6/4484 (EP,US);
G02B6/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer optischen Leitung | [1990/27] | English: | Method of manufacturing an optical cable | [1990/27] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un câble optique | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 01.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/09] | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2434280 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]DE2459997 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2514996 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]DE2519680 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]DE2609693 (SIEMENS AG) |