EP0375068 - Combining bismuth compounds and tetracyclines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIST-BROCADES N.V. Wateringseweg 1 P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | [1990/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castelijns, Lodewijk Franciscus Pancratius Kerkstraat 29 NL-5529 AK Casteren / NL | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Lavy, Uriel, et al Gist-Brocades NV Patents and Trademarks Dept. Wateringseweg 1 P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Lavy, Uriel, et al Gist-Brocades NV Patents and Trademarks Dept. Wateringseweg 1 P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 89203250.9 | 18.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | EP19880203006 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: EP 88203006 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375068 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/24, A61K31/65, A61K31/29, // (A61K33/24, 31:65, 31:29) | [1990/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/65 (EP);
A61K33/245 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/65, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/245, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/245, A61K31/65, A61K31/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Mischungen von Bismuth-Verbindungen und Tetracyclinen | [1990/26] | English: | Combining bismuth compounds and tetracyclines | [1990/26] | French: | Associations de composés de bismuth et de tétracyclines | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/35] | 02.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO8605981 ; | [AD]EP0206625 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 77, no. 21, 20th November 1972, page 29, abstract no. 135209k, Columbus, Ohio, US; J. VYHNALEK et al.: "Application of terapeutan in diarrhoeic diseases of calves and piglets", & VETERINARIA (PRAGUE) 1972, 14(1)33-43 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 68, no. 19, 6th May 1968, page 8682, abstract no. 85855g, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. SCIORTINO et al.: "Tetracycline-bismuth incompability in pharmaceutical preparations", & BOLL. CHIM. FARM. 107(1)47-53 |