EP0325351 - Switchable MRI RF coil array with individual coils having different and overlapping fields of view [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California (OIPA) Wilshire Center Suite 1200 10920 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90024-1406 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 2199 Addison Street Berkeley, California 94720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufman, Leon 127 16th Avenue San Francisco California 94118 / US | 02 /
Arakawa, Mitsuaki 1005 Lakeview Drive Hillsborough California 94010 / US | 03 /
McCarten, Barry M. 544 Gabilan Street Los Altos California 94022 / US | 04 /
Fehn, John H. 4058 Lambert Road El Sobrante California 94803 / US | 05 /
Krasnor, Stephen 323 Hanover Avenue Aprt. 6 Oakland California 94606 / US | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/49] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/30] | Allman, Peter John MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300165.1 | 10.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | US19880145279 | 19.01.1988 Original published format: US 145279 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325351 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325351 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325351 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/34, G01R33/36 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
G01R33/3415 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/30] | G01N24/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | Schaltbare Vielfachanordnung von Hochfrequenzspulen mit verschiedenen und überlappenden Blickfeldern der einzelnen Spulen zur Bilderzeugung mittels magnetischer Resonanz | [1989/30] | English: | Switchable MRI RF coil array with individual coils having different and overlapping fields of view | [1989/30] | French: | Réseau commutable de bobines haute fréquence présentant individuellement des champs de vue différents et se recouvrant partiellement pour l'imagerie par résonance magnétique | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.1995 | BE | 17.05.1995 | CH | 17.05.1995 | ES | 17.05.1995 | FR | 17.05.1995 | GR | 17.05.1995 | IT | 17.05.1995 | LI | 17.05.1995 | NL | 17.05.1995 | SE | 17.08.1995 | DE | 18.08.1995 | LU | 31.01.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
ES | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
IT | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
NL | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
ES | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
IT | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
IT | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
IT | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/16] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
BE | 17.05.1995 | ||
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
LI | 17.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0175129 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US4717881 (FLUGAN DAVID C [US]); | [AP]EP0276509 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [XP]EP0280908 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [AP] - BOOK OF ABSTRACTS, SOCIETY OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 7TH ANNUAL MEETING, San Francisco, California, 20th - 26th August 1988, vol. 2, page 839; W.R.M. MENS et al.: "Simultaneous use of array coil parts" | Examination | EP0170514 | - BOOK OF ABSTRACTS, SOCIETY OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 6TH ANNUAL MEETING, New York, 17-21 August 1987, page 408; H. REQUARDT et al.: "Switched array coils : a new multi-purpose tool in MRI" |