EP0333308 - Dual lumen catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAS-CATH INCORPORATED 2380 Tedlo Street Mississauga Ontario L5A 3V3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states VAS-CATH INCORPORATED 2380 Tedlo Street Mississauga Ontario L5A 3V3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Geoffrey S. 159 Donnelly Drive Mississauga Ontario, L5G 2M3 / CA | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Lyons, Andrew John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | Lyons, Andrew John, et al ROYSTONS Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300364.0 | 16.01.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | CA19880561705 | 17.03.1988 Original published format: CA 561705 | [1989/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0333308 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0333308 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0333308 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [1989/38] | CPC: |
A61M25/0026 (EP);
A61M2025/0031 (EP);
A61M2025/0037 (EP);
A61M25/0029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/38] | Title | German: | Doppellumenkatheter | [1989/38] | English: | Dual lumen catheter | [1989/38] | French: | Catheter à double lumen | [1989/38] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4619643 ; | [Y]US4551292 ; | [A]CA1219785 ; | [AP]DE8805515U ; | [A]FR2530958 |