EP0329273 - Process for producing 2,6-naphthalene dicarboxylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanchez, Paul Anthony 5931 Oakwood Drive Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | 02 /
Young, David Allen 3 South 532 Tinker Warrenville Illinois 60555 / US | 03 /
Kuhlmann, George Edward 2 Ottawa Court Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 04 /
Partenheimer, Walter 352 Pearson Circle Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 05 /
Schammel, Wayne Paul 1513 Marquette Avenue Naperville Illinois 60565 / US | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300437.4 | 18.01.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | US19880145299 | 19.01.1988 Original published format: US 145299 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0329273 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0329273 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329273 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C63/38, C07C51/265 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
C07C51/265 (EP);
C07C63/38 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/265, C07C63/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2,6-Naphthalindicarbonsäure | [1989/34] | English: | Process for producing 2,6-naphthalene dicarboxylic acid | [1989/34] | French: | Procédé de production d'acide 2,6-naphtalènedicarboxylique | [1989/34] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 07.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1995 | ES | 27.12.1995 | IT | 27.12.1995 | NL | 27.12.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
ES | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
NL | 27.12.1995 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
ES | 27.12.1995 | ||
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.12.1995 | |
IT | 27.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 27.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3150172 (SERRES JR CARL, et al); | [X]GB2187744 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]EP0323309 (SUMIKIN CHEMICAL [JP]) |