EP0325432 - Multi input lightning detection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BFGoodrich Flight Systems, Inc. 7020 Huntley Road Columbus Ohio 43229 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states BFGoodrich FlightSystems, Inc. 7020 Huntley Road Columbus Ohio 43229 / US | ||
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostrander, Kenneth A. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Foster, David Martyn, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Foster, David Martyn, et al MATHISEN MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | ||
Former [1989/30] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89300455.6 | 18.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | US19880145276 | 19.01.1988 Original published format: US 145276 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325432 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325432 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325432 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01W1/16 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
G01W1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/30] | Title | German: | Multi-Eintrittblitzdetektionsvorrichtung | [1989/30] | English: | Multi input lightning detection system | [1989/30] | French: | Système de détection de foudre à entrées multiples | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.12.1995 | DE | 28.03.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [1996/44] | DE | 28.03.1996 | |
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | FR | 24.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2297429 (DYTRONICS CY INC [US]); | [A]US4198599 (KRIDER EDMUND P [US], et al); | [A]EP0058467 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [AD]EP0058502 (COLEMAN ERNEST WILSON); | [AD]EP0186402 (ERNCO IND INC [US]) |