EP0325455 - Intercommunication method and system thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.05.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2000 | Opposition rejected | published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA UNIVERSAL 561, Oaza Arai Oyama-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | [1989/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Naomi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Universaltechnos 1-7-8 Hamacho Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300501.7 | 19.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | JP19880010931 | 22.01.1988 Original published format: JP 1093188 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325455 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325455 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325455 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/34, G07F9/08, H04L12/42, H04L12/28 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
H04L12/403 (EP);
G07F17/32 (EP);
G07F9/08 (EP);
H04L12/423 (EP);
H04L12/437 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/19] | G07F17/34, G07F9/08, H04L12/42, H04L11/16 | ||
Former IPC [1989/30] | H04L11/16, G07F9/08, G07F17/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1989/30] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungsverfahren und -system | [1989/30] | English: | Intercommunication method and system thereof | [1989/30] | French: | Méthode et système d'intercommunication | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 30.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.1995
28.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE NSM AG Postfach 15 64 Saarlandstrasse 240 D-55385 Bingen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Gossel, Hans K. Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.1995
28.12.1995
ADMISSIBLE NSM AG Postfach 15 64 Saarlandstrasse 240 D-55385 Bingen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Gossel, Hans K. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | 01.02.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.05.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 07.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.12.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.02.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.02.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0091129 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [AP]FR2603401 (MAQUINAS AUTOMAT COMPUTER [ES]) | [A] - JAPAN TELECOMMUNICATION REVIEW, vol 27, no. 1, 1st January 1985, pages 34-40, Tokyo (JP) H. SHIRAKAWA: "100 mbits/s optical loop network supports" |