EP0327378 - Domain-modified constant region antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Revocation of patent | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York West 116th Street and Broadway New York New York 10027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK West 116th Street and Broadway New York, New York 10027 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK West 116th Street and Broadway New York, New York 10027 / US | ||
For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | |||
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York Broadway and West 116th Street New York, NY 10027 / US | ||
For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morrison, Sherie L 31,Claremont Road Scardsdale New York 10583 / US | 02 /
Oi, Vernon T. 1259 Marilyn Court Mount View, California 94040 / US | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1989/32] | Harrison, David Christopher MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301052.0 | 03.02.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | US19880152741 | 05.02.1988 Original published format: US 152741 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327378 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327378 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12P21/00 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1996/38] |
Former [1996/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | ||
Former [1989/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Modifikation der Domäne der Konstantregion der Antikörpern | [1989/32] | English: | Domain-modified constant region antibodies | [1989/32] | French: | Modification du domain de la region constant des anticorps | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE Celltech Therapeutics Ltd 216 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE Celltech Therapeutics Ltd 216 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 20.10.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.07.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.10.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.01.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/14] | Appeal following opposition | 21.02.2001 | Appeal received No. T0236/01 | 23.04.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.09.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | Request for further processing for: | 07.12.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.12.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0184187 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0239400 (WINTER GREGORY PAUL); | [XP]WO8807089 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB]); | [X]EP0125023 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 7, 17th August 1987, abstract no. 57101r, Columbus, Ohio, US; MARC J. SCHULMAN et al.: "Completement activation by IgM: evidence for the importance of the third constant domain of the u heavy chain", & Eur. J. Immunol. 1987, vol. 17, no. 4, pages 549-554 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 15, 9th April 1984, abstract no. 119073z, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. OI et al.: "Hybridoma antibody-producing switch variants: a variant lacking the CH1 domain", & Miles Int. Symp. Ser. 1984, vol. 14, pages 281-287 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 7, 18th August 1986, abstract no. 59187f, Columbus, Ohio, US; G. SARMY et al.: "CH2 and CH3 domain deleted igG1 paraproteins inhibit differently Fc receptor mediated binding and cytolysis", & Immunol. Lett. 1986, vol. 12, no. 5,6, pages 307-312 | [AD] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA) vol. 81 November 1984, pages 6851-6855. Washington, USA; SHERIE L. MORRISON et al.: "Chimeric human antibody molecules mouse antigen-binding domains with human constant domains". | [AD] - NATURE, vol. 312, 13th December 1984, pages 604-608, London, GB; MICHAEL S. NEUBERGER et al.: "Recombinant antibodies possessing novel effector functions". | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 107, no.7, 17th August 1987, abstract no. 57101r, Columbus, Ohio, US; MARC J. SCHULMAN et al.: & EUR. J. Immunol. 1987, vol. 17, no. 4, pages 549-554 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 100, no. 15, 9th April 1984, abstract no. 119073z, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. OI et al; & Miles Int. Symp. Ser. 1984, vol. 14, pages 281-287 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 105, no. 7, 18th August 1986, abstract no. 59187f, Columbus, Ohio, US; G. SARMAY et al; & Immunol. Lett. 1986, vol. 12, no. 5,6, pages 307-312 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA vol. 81, November 1984, pages 6851-6855, Washington, USA; SHERIE L. MORRISON et al; abstract, figure 1; page 6854c2 | - NATURE vol. 312, 13th December 1984, pages 604-608, London, GB; MICHAEL S. NEUBERGER et al.: abstract, figure 1; page 605c2, page 607 |