EP0330343 - Printing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1989/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gabbe, David 63 Lincoln Street Hudson, MA 01749 / US | 02 /
Batchelder, Ned 299 Tappan Street, 9 Brookline, MA 02146 / US | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301248.4 | 09.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | US19880159947 | 24.02.1988 Original published format: US 159947 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330343 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330343 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330343 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/60 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G06K15/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/35] | G06F15/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/35] | Title | German: | Druckapparat und -verfahren | [1989/35] | English: | Printing apparatus and method | [1989/35] | French: | Appareil et méthode d'impression | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 03.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2160055 (GERBER SCIENTIFIC INSTR CO); | [A]GB2128843 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) | Examination | - The Complete HyperCard Handbook, 2nd edition, October 1988, Chapter 3,'HyperCard Linking and Printing' by D Goodman, Bantam Books Inc NY, pages 65-81. |