EP0337595 - Integrated circuit having a configurable terminal pin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freidin, Philip 1616 Hollenbeck Avenue Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301378.9 | 14.02.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | US19880167670 | 14.03.1988 Original published format: US 167670 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337595 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337595 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
G06F1/22 (EP,US);
H03K5/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/42] | Title | German: | Integrierte Schaltung mit konfigurierbaren Anschlussstiften | [1989/42] | English: | Integrated circuit having a configurable terminal pin | [1989/42] | French: | Circuit intégré à fiche de raccordement configurable | [1989/42] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/23] | 23.01.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61059562 ; | [A]US4306163 (BLUME JR HENRY M, et al); | [A]EP0047128 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 223 (P-483)[2279], 5th August 1986; & JP-A-61 059 562 (FUJITSU LTD) 27-03-1986, & JP61059562 A 00000000 | [A] - EDN, vol. 26, no. 1, May 1981, page 197, Boston, MA, US; J. THOMAS: "6805-muC I/O provides versatility" |