EP0329416 - Process for preparing 4-hydroxyacetophenone oxime with mother liquor recycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION Route 202-206 North Somerville, N.J. 08876 / US | [1989/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fruchey, Olan Stanley 2310 Raintree Corpus Christi Texas / US | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1989/34] | Application number, filing date | 89301443.1 | 15.02.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | US19880157186 | 16.02.1988 Original published format: US 157186 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0329416 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0329416 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C131/00 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
C07C249/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 4-Hydroxyacetophenon-oxim mit Zurückführung von Mutterlauge | [1989/34] | English: | Process for preparing 4-hydroxyacetophenone oxime with mother liquor recycle | [1989/34] | French: | Procédé pour préparer une acétophénone-oxime-4-hydroxy avec recyclage de liqueur-mère | [1989/34] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0168908 |