EP0329443 - Clamps and clamp assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilde, Melvyn c/o Mel Wilde Products, Unit 1A, Empress Industrial Estate Anderton Street Wigan Lancs. WN2 2BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states Wilde, Melvyn Unit 1A, Empress Industrial Estate Anderton Street Higher Ince Wigan / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Berry, Neil 207 Moss Lane Bramhall Stockport SK7 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Berry, Neil 207 Moss Lane Bramhall Stockport SK7 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301498.5 | 16.02.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | GB19880003961 | 19.02.1988 Original published format: GB 8803961 | GB19880021099 | 08.09.1988 Original published format: GB 8821099 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0329443 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329443 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04, F16B7/00 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
F16B7/1472 (EP,US);
F16B2/065 (EP,US);
F16B7/044 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32426 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7003 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1989/34] | Title | German: | Klemmen und Klemm-Montage | [1989/34] | English: | Clamps and clamp assemblies | [1989/34] | French: | Brides et montage avec des brides | [1989/34] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 08.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2410162 [ ] (NASI CESAR [FR]); | GB2116816 [ ] (ELLIS PATENTS LIMITED); | DE3207966 [ ] (KUETTENBAUM VALENTIN) | Examination | EP0251363 | GB547701 |