EP0355042 - Low data rate low noise serial digital communications link for magnetic resonance imaging systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California (OIPA) Wilshire Center Suite 1200 10920 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90024-1406 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/08] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 2199 Addison Street Berkeley, California 94720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoenninger III, John C. 2616 Beaconsfield Place Oakland California 94611 / US | 02 /
Hosier, Kenneth E., Jr. P.O. Box 752 Orinda California 94563 / US | [1990/08] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/51] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/08] | Smith, Norman Ian F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301623.8 | 20.02.1989 | [1990/08] | Priority number, date | US19880235362 | 19.08.1988 Original published format: US 235362 | US19880291956 | 29.12.1988 Original published format: US 291956 | [1990/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355042 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355042 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355042 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/54 | [1990/08] | CPC: |
G01R33/54 (EP,US);
G05B19/0423 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21097 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25037 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25051 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25197 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/08] | Title | German: | Seriell digitale Kommunikationsverbindung mit niedriger Datenrate und niedrigem Rauschen für Bilderzeugungssysteme mittels magnetischer Resonanz | [1990/08] | English: | Low data rate low noise serial digital communications link for magnetic resonance imaging systems | [1990/08] | French: | Connexion pour la communication numérique en série, présentant un bas débit de données et un bas bruit, dans un système d'imagerie par résonance magnétique | [1990/08] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.1996 | BE | 27.03.1996 | CH | 27.03.1996 | ES | 27.03.1996 | FR | 27.03.1996 | GR | 27.03.1996 | IT | 27.03.1996 | LI | 27.03.1996 | NL | 27.03.1996 | SE | 27.06.1996 | DE | 28.06.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
ES | 27.03.1996 | ||
GR | 27.03.1996 | ||
IT | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
NL | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
DE | 28.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
ES | 27.03.1996 | ||
GR | 27.03.1996 | ||
IT | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
DE | 28.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
GR | 27.03.1996 | ||
IT | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
DE | 28.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
IT | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
DE | 28.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
DE | 28.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
DE | 28.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
DE | 28.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 27.03.1996 | |
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 27.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3786419 (NICK H); | [Y]EP0166402 (ALLEN BRADLEY CO [US]); | [YD]US4599565 (HOENNINGER III JOHN C [US], et al); | [A]JPS62207044 (HITACHI LTD) | [A] - MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING, vol. 26, no. 2, March 1988, pages 221-224, Stevenage, GB; S. PITTARD et al.: "Nuclear magnetic resonance imaging using on microcomputer" |