EP0330459 - Apparatus for delivering breathable gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jackson, Richard Robert One Atlantic Avenue Swampscott, MA 01907 / US | [1989/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Meeks, Frank Burton, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | [1989/35] | Application number, filing date | 89301746.7 | 23.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | US19880160329 | 25.02.1988 Original published format: US 160329 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330459 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330459 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/16 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
A61M16/08 (EP,US);
A61M16/0833 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M16/142 (EP,US);
A61M16/208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/35] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Abgabe eines Atemgases | [1989/35] | English: | Apparatus for delivering breathable gas | [1989/35] | French: | Appareil délivrant un gaz respiratoire | [1989/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 10.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/08] | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.09.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   15.10.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3865106 (PALUSH BERNARD P); | [AD]US3871373 (JACKSON RICHARD R); | [A]US4333451 (PALUCH BERNARD R); | [A]US4396015 (JOHNSON ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US4456008 (CLAWSON BURRELL E [US], et al) |