EP0331356 - Expression of HIV binding proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arthos, James 2026 Hill Street Ann Arbor Michigan 48104 / US | 02 /
Clark, Philip Ernest 12 Donna Lane Wayne Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 03 /
Fornwald, James Allan 104 Burnside Avenue Norristown Pennsylvania 19403 / US | 04 /
Brawner, Mary Ellen 126 Valley Stream Circle Wayne Pennsylvania 19087 / US | 05 /
Deen, Keith Charles 21 Maude Circle Paoli Pennsylvania 19301 / US | 06 /
Gorman, Jessica Angell 152 Ridgefield Road Newtown Square Pennsylvania 19073 / US | 07 /
Sathe, Ganesh Madhusudan 412 Hillside Road King of Prussia Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 08 /
Sweet, Raymond Whitney 108 Edgehill Road Bala Cynwyd Pennsylvania 19004 / US | 09 /
Taylor, Dean Perron 400 Hillside Road King of Prussia Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Giddings, Peter John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Giddings, Peter John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [1989/36] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301803.6 | 23.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | US19880160463 | 24.02.1988 Original published format: US 160463 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331356 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331356 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N1/20, C12N1/18, C12P21/02, A61K37/02, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:19, 1:465) | [1989/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/70514 (EP);
C12N15/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Expression von HIV-bindenden Proteinen | [1989/36] | English: | Expression of HIV binding proteins | [1989/36] | French: | Expression de protéines de fixant au VIH | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 10.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 31.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/09] | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO8801304 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]); | [E]WO8901940 (BIOGEN INC [US]) | [X] - THE EMBO JOURNAL, vol. 3, no. 10, October 1984, pages 2437-2442, IRL Press Limited, Oxford, GB; J. GHRAYEB et al.: "Secretion cloning vectors in Escherichia coli" | [Y] - NATURE, vol. 331, no. 6151, January 7, 1988, pages 82-84; K.C. DEEN ET AL.: "A soluble form of CD4(T4) protein inhibits AIDS virus infection" | [XP] - CELL, vol. 57, May 5, 1989, pages 469-481, Cell Press; J. ARTHOS et al.: "Identification of the residues in human CD4 critical for the binding HIV" |