EP0331423 - Heat-responsive element for fire protection sprinklers or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRINNELL CORPORATION Three Tyco Park Exeter New Hampshire 03833 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states GRINNELL CORPORATION Three Tyco Park Exeter New Hampshire 03833 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, James M. 75 Meadowbrook Road East Greenwich Rhode Island / US | 02 /
Fleury, Leo W., Jr. 180 Rocky Hill Road North Smithfield Rhode Island / US | 03 /
Fisher, Michael A. No. 2 Knowles Lane West Kingston Rhode Island / US | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301964.6 | 28.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | US19880162479 | 01.03.1988 Original published format: US 162479 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331423 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331423 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A62C37/12, F16K17/40, G05D23/02 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
G05D23/026 (EP,US);
A62C37/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/36] | Title | German: | Auf Wärme ansprechendes Element für Feuerulöschdüsen oder dergleichen | [1989/36] | English: | Heat-responsive element for fire protection sprinklers or the like | [1989/36] | French: | Elément réagissant à la température pour des arroseurs d'incendie et similaires | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/23] | 07.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2571826 (ROCHE KERANDRAON OLIVER [FR]); | [A]US4102482 (RUEGSEGGER DONALD RAY); | [A]AU2485767 ; | [AP]US4771270 (KELSO JAMES W [US]); | [A]GB2049415 (GRINNELL FIRE PROTECTION); | [A]US3866686 (GOODSELL JR EARL M, et al) |