EP0343770 - Multi-bus microcomputer system with bus arbitration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Begun, Ralph Murray 32 SW 13th Avenue Boca Raton Florida 33486 / US | 02 /
Bland, Patrick Maurice 4535 Palm Ridge Blvd. Delray Beach Florida 33445 / US | 03 /
Dean, Mark Edward 5054 Beechwood Road Delray Beach Florida 33484 / US | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1989/48] | Hawkins, Anthony George Frederick IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302162.6 | 03.03.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | US19880198895 | 26.05.1988 Original published format: US 198895 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343770 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343770 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343770 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/36 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
G06F8/71 (EP,US);
G02B27/28 (EP,US);
G03B21/604 (EP,US);
G06F13/36 (EP,US);
G06F13/362 (EP,US);
G06F8/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Mehrfachbus-Mikrorechnersystem mit Busarbitrierung | [1989/48] | English: | Multi-bus microcomputer system with bus arbitration | [1989/48] | French: | Système de microcalculateur à bus multiple avec arbitrage d'accès au bus | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.1995 | BE | 24.05.1995 | CH | 24.05.1995 | LI | 24.05.1995 | SE | 24.08.1995 | [1996/04] |
Former [1996/02] | AT | 24.05.1995 | |
CH | 24.05.1995 | ||
LI | 24.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 24.05.1995 | |
LI | 24.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0066766 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4414624 (SUMMER JR CHARLES F [US], et al); | [A]EP0192366 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) | [A] - NEW ELECTRONICS, vol. 20, no. 7, 31st March 1987, pages 30-33, London, GB; "Extending 80386 performance" | [A] - ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, vol. 56, no. 19, September 1983, pages 155-158, New York, US; M. BARON: "Stopping system memory and bus from putting the squeeze on fast CPUs" | [A] - COMPUTER DESIGN, vol. 23, no. 13, November 1984, pages 133-138, Littleton, Massachusetts, US; W. MAYBERRY et al.: "Cache boosts multiprocessor performance" |