EP0335513 - Device for assisting in dispensing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dispomed Limited 6 Druids Park Calderstones Liverpool, L18 3LJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states Dispomed Limited 6 Druids Park Calderstones Liverpool, L18 3LJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prebble, Ernest Porter 6 Druids Park Calderstones Liverpool L18 3LS / GB | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Lyons, Andrew John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Lyons, Andrew John, et al ROYSTONS Tower Building Water Street Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302221.0 | 06.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | GB19880007728 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: GB 8807728 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0335513 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0335513 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335513 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/00 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
A61F9/0026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/40] | Title | German: | Verabreichungshilfe | [1989/40] | English: | Device for assisting in dispensing | [1989/40] | French: | Dispositif pour faciliter l'administration | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 20.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.1993 | CH | 12.05.1993 | FR | 12.05.1993 | GR | 12.05.1993 | LI | 12.05.1993 | SE | 12.05.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 12.05.1993 | |
CH | 12.05.1993 | ||
GR | 12.05.1993 | ||
LI | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 12.05.1993 | ||
FR | 01.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 12.05.1993 | |
CH | 12.05.1993 | ||
LI | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 12.05.1993 | ||
FR | 01.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | CH | 12.05.1993 | |
LI | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 12.05.1993 | ||
FR | 01.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | CH | 12.05.1993 | |
LI | 12.05.1993 | ||
SE | 12.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | SE | 12.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE594860 (ALFRED MENDEL); | [A]FR1263954 ; | [A]GB1163903 (BRITISH AIRCRAFT CORP LTD [GB]); | [A]US3872866 (LELICOFF JHON); | [A]US4134403 (JOHNSEN FRANK R, et al); | [XP]US4792334 (PY DANIEL [US]) |