EP0335528 - DNA promoter fragments from wheat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.1992 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | For all designated states STATE OF OREGON BY AND THROUGH THE OREGON STATE BOARD OF HIGHER EDUCATION ON BEHALF OF OREGON STATE UNIVERSITY Administrative Services (A312) Corvallis Oregon 97331-2140 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states STATE OF OREGON BY AND THROUGH THE OREGON STATE BOARD OF HIGHER EDUCATION ON BEHALF OF OREGON STATE UNIVERSITY Administrative Services (A312) Corvallis, Oregon 97331-2140 / US | |||
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
For all designated states STATE OF OREGON, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE OREGON STATE BOARD OF HIGHER EDUCATION ON BEHALF OF OREGON STATE UNIVERSITY Corvallis Oregon 97331-2140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Litts, James Cooper 1302 L Street Davis California 95616 / US | 02 /
Marcotte, William Richard, Jr. 2007 Ferguson Drive Wilmington Delaware 19808 / US | 03 /
Quatrano, Ralph Stephen 1900 Greenhill Avenue Wilmington Delaware 19806 / US | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302566.8 | 15.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | US19880174744 | 29.03.1988 Original published format: US 174744 | US19880247185 | 21.09.1988 Original published format: US 247185 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0335528 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0335528 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, A01H1/00, C12N5/00 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
C12N15/8234 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
C12N15/8238 (EP);
C12N15/8273 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GR [1989/40] | Title | German: | DNS-Promotorfragmente aus Weizen | [1989/40] | English: | DNA promoter fragments from wheat | [1989/40] | French: | Fragments promoteurs d'ADN à partir du blé | [1989/40] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/37: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89904391.3/0409869 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 24.07.92 | EPB 1992/37: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89904391.3/0409869 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 24.07.92 | EPB 1992/37: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89904391.3/0409869 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 24.07.92 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPO] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY SUPPLEMENT 12c, 1988, UCLA SYMPOSIA ON MOLECULAR & CELLULAR BIOLOGY, ABSTRACTS 17TH ANNUAL MEETINGS, 28th February - 10th April 1988, ABSTRACTS AVAILABLE FROM 28th February 1988, page 152, abstract no. L052; R.S. QUATRANO et al.: "Control of cereal embryogenesis and the regulation of gene expression by abscisic acid (ABA)" | [XO] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY SUPPLEMENT 12c, 1988, UCLA SYMPOSIA ON MOLECULAR & CELLULAR BIOLOGY, ABSTRACTS 17TH ANNUAL MEETINGS, 28th February - 10th April 1988, ABSTRACTS AVAILABLE FROM 28th February 1988, page 164, abstract no. L124; W.R. MARCOTTE, Jr. et al.: "Hormone-regulated gene expression" | [XP] - NATURE, vol. 335, 29th September 1988, pages 454-457; W.R. MARCOTTE, Jr. et al.: "Regulation of a wheat promoter by abscisic acid in rice protoplasts" | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE OF THE USA, vol. 83, no. 18, September 1986, pages 6815-6819, Washington, DC, US; T.-M. OU-LEE et al.: "Expression of a foreign gene linked to either a plant-virus or a Drosophila promoter, after electroporation of protoplasts of rice, wheat, and sorghum" | [Y] - TRENDS IN GENETICS, vol. 4, no. 1, January 1988, pages 13-18, Elsevier Publications, Cambridge, GB; L. WILLMITZER: "The use of transgenic plants to study plant gene expression" | [A] - THE EMBO JOURNAL, vol. 7, no. 2, February 1988, pages 297-302, IRL Press Ltd, Oxford, GB; Z.-L. CHEN et al.: "A DNA sequence element that confers seed-specific enhancement to a constitutive promoter" | by applicant | US4579821 | US4703005 | - KUHLEMEIER, ANN. REV. PL. PHYSIOL., (1987), vol. 38, pages 221 - 257 | - HOOFT VANHUIJSDUIJNEN, J. GEN. VIROL., (1986), vol. 67, pages 235 - 2143 | - ADDICOTT, ABSCISIC ACID, PRAEGER PUBL., (1983), page 607 | - ZEEVAART; CREELMAN, ANN. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 39, pages 439 - 473 | - WALTON, IN ABSCISIC ACID, (1983), vol. 4, pages 113 - 146 | - QUATRANO, "Oxford Surveys Pl", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 3, pages 467 - 477 | - BRAY, PLANTA, (1987), vol. 172, pages 364 - 370 | - BARKER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 458 - 462 | - GOMEZ, NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 262 - 264 | - MUNDY; CHUA, EMBO JOURNAL, (1988), vol. 7, pages 2279 - 2286 | - CHEN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 8560 - 8564 | - CHEN, EMBO JOURNAL, (1988), vol. 7, pages 297 - 302 | - EBERT, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 5795 - 5799 | - HOWARD, PLANTA, (1987), vol. 170, pages 535 - 540 | - LEE, PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 85, pages 327 - 330 | - WALKER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI (USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 6624 - 6628 | - ELLIS, EMBO JOURNAL, (1987), vol. 6, pages 11 - 16 | - JEFFERSON, PI, MOL. BIOL, REP., (1988), vol. 5, pages 387 - 405 | - GRZELCZAK, CANAD. J. BIOCHEM., (1982), vol. 60, pages 389 - 397 | - WILLIAMSON; QUATRANO, EUROP. J. BIOCHEM., (1985), vol. 152, pages 501 - 507 | - WILLIAMSON; QUATRANO, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 86, pages 208 - 215 | - KHAVKIN, PLANTA, (1978), vol. 143, pages 11 - 20 | - CASEY, OXFORD SURVEYS PI. MOL. CELL BIOL., (1986), vol. 3, pages 1 - 95 | - ADDICOTT; LYON, ANN. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL., (1969), vol. 20, pages 139 - 164 | - ZEEVAART; CREELMAN, ANN. REV. PLANT PHYSIOL, (1988), vol. 39, pages 439 - 473 | - MANIATIS, MOLECULAR CLONING; A LABORATORY MANUAL, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1962), page 440 | - ZAGURSKY, GENE ANAL.TECH., (1985), vol. 2, pages 89 - 94 | - CHU, SCI SINICA, (1975), vol. 18, pages 659 - 668 | - KYOZUKA, MOL. GEN. GENET., (1987), vol. 206, pages 408 - 413 | - GROSSMAN, J. PLANT. PHYSIOL., (1985), vol. 121, pages 361 - 367 | - J. AGRON. CROP SCI., (1984), vol. 153, pages 14 - 22 | - FLORES, J. PLANT PHYSIOL., (1988), vol. 132, pages 362 - 369 | - JUNG; GROSSMANN, J. PLANT PHYSIOL., (1985), vol. 121, pages 361 - 367 | - HORSCH, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 227, pages 1229 - 1231 | - PIETRZAK, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, pages 5857 - 5868 | - JEFFERSON, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 8447 - 8451 | - JEFFERSON, PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REPORTER, (1987), vol. 5, pages 387 - 405 | - JEFFERSON, EMBO, (1987), vol. 6, pages 3901 - 3907 | - MCCUBBIN, CAN. J. BIOCHEM. CELL BIOL., (1985), vol. 63, pages 803 - 811 | - LITTS, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 3607 - 3618 | - GUERRERO; MULLET, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1986), vol. 80, pages 588 - 591 |