EP0333503 - Curable resinous composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states KURARAY Co. LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Koichi C/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City / JP | 02 /
Omura, Ikuo C/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City / JP | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1989/38] | Application number, filing date | 89302654.2 | 17.03.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | JP19880065288 | 17.03.1988 Original published format: JP 6528888 | [1989/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0333503 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0333503 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0333503 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/08, C08K9/04, C08L33/06 | [1989/38] | CPC: |
A61L24/0089 (EP,US);
A61K6/20 (EP,US);
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
A61K6/74 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
A61K6/90 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K6/20, C08L33/00 (EP,US);
A61K6/30, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
A61K6/887, C08L33/00 (EP,US);
A61K6/90, C08L33/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/38] | Title | German: | Härtbare Harzzusammensetzung | [1989/38] | English: | Curable resinous composition | [1989/38] | French: | Composition résineuse durcissable | [1989/38] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 12.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP57108164 ; | [XD]JP57128728 ; | [XD]JP57168954 ; | [A]GB2013218 (G C DENTAL IND CORP); | [A]EP0053442 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0084407 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]EP0088527 (DENTSPLY LTD [GB]); | [XP]WO8806589 (LANDANGER SA ETS [FR]) | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 197 (C-128)[1075], 6th October 1982; & JP-A-57 108 164 (SHIRAISHI CHUO KENKYUSHO K.K.), & JP57108164 A 00000000 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 223 (C-133)[1101], 9th November 1982; & JP-A-57 128 728 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU), & JP57128728 A 00000000 | [XD] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN: 82-01244J(47); & JP-A-57168954 (OKAYAMA-KEN), & JP57168954 A 00000000 |