EP0334563 - Tool coupling apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tella, Richard P. 581 Carlisle Way Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | 02 /
Lerna, Stuart D. 1145 Judson Avenue Evanston Illinois 60602 / US | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89302685.6 | 17.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | US19880172611 | 24.03.1988 Original published format: US 172611 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334563 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334563 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/04 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
B23Q3/15506 (EP,US);
B23Q3/15553 (EP,US);
B25J15/0475 (EP,US);
B25J15/0491 (EP,US);
F16B2200/30 (EP,US);
Y10S294/902 (EP,US);
Y10S483/901 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17786 (EP,US);
Y10T403/606 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/39] | Title | German: | Werkzeugkupplungsverfahren und -vorrichtung | [1989/39] | English: | Tool coupling apparatus and method | [1989/39] | French: | Méthode et dispositif d'accouplage d'outils | [1989/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/33] | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4281447 (MILLER GEORGE J, et al); | [X]US4655630 (RINEHART RONALD A [US]); | [X]GB2118522 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [Y]US4650256 (WETZINGER JOHANN [AT]); | [X]EP0155362 (IBM [US]); | [X]EP0168945 (EMI LTD [GB]); | [A]GB1106968 (STEEPER HUGH LTD); | [A]FR1328613 (PYE LTD); | [A]FR2411061 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]FR2540027 (GARNIER ANDRE [FR]); | [A]US4660274 (GOUMAS PETER G [US], et al) |