EP0369568 - Dispensers for viscous materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.C. Cox (Newbury) Limited Turnpike Industrial Estate Turnpike Road Shaw Newbury Berkshire RG13 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states P.C. Cox (Newbury) Limited Turnpike Industrial Estate Turnpike Road Shaw Newbury Berkshire RG13 2QR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cox, John Patrick Anthony 95 High Street Hungerford Berkshire, RG17 0NB / GB | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303171.6 | 30.03.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | GB19880026685 | 15.11.1988 Original published format: GB 8826685 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0369568 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/76, B65D83/00, B05C17/005 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
B05C17/00513 (EP);
B05C17/00516 (EP);
B05C17/00553 (EP);
B05C17/015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | Spender für viskose Massen | [1990/21] | English: | Dispensers for viscous materials | [1990/21] | French: | Distributeurs de produits visqueux | [1990/21] | File destroyed: | 05.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/27] | 12.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8702055U ; | [X]FR2580522 ; | [X]DE3418052 ; | [A]EP0236129 |