EP0338727 - Connector assembly having a latching mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1989/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myers, Clyde Jackson 736 Lioness Court Stone Mountain Georgia 30087 / US | 02 /
Stephenson, Daniel Lee 6109 Zachary Drive Norcross Georgia 30093 / US | 03 /
Travieso, Ruben 1404 Summerchase Drive Duluth Georgia 30136 / US | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303679.8 | 13.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | US19880183194 | 19.04.1988 Original published format: US 183194 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0338727 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0338727 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338727 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/506 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/3893 (EP,US);
G02B6/36 (KR);
G02B6/3817 (EP,US);
G02B6/3821 (EP,US);
G02B6/3849 (EP,US);
G02B6/3878 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/43] | Title | German: | Verbindervorrichtung mit Verriegelungsmechanismus | [1989/43] | English: | Connector assembly having a latching mechanism | [1989/43] | French: | Assemblage de connecteur avec un mécanisme de verrouillage | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3937547 (LEE-KEMP KENNETH WILLIAM); | [X]CH609494 (INTERLEMO HOLDING SA [CH]); | [X]EP0117022 (AMP INC [US]); | [A]WO8600147 (AMP INC [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 25, no. 11B, April 1983, NEW YORK US pages 6282 - 6283; E. C. überbacher: "optical connector" |