EP0344896 - A lining laminate for a pipeline and an operation method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takei, Norio 19-24, Mita 4-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303749.9 | 14.04.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | JP19880135409 | 03.06.1988 Original published format: JP 13540988 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344896 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344896 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L58/18, F16L55/16, F16L58/10 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
F16L57/00 (EP,US);
F16L55/1653 (EP,US);
F16L58/1045 (EP,US);
F16L58/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | Beschichtungslaminat für eine Pipeline und Anwendungsverfahren dafür | [1989/49] | English: | A lining laminate for a pipeline and an operation method thereof | [1989/49] | French: | Laminé pour le gainage de conduites et méthode d'application | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/08] | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.06.1992 | CH | 17.06.1992 | DE | 17.06.1992 | ES | 17.06.1992 | FR | 17.06.1992 | IT | 17.06.1992 | LI | 17.06.1992 | NL | 17.06.1992 | SE | 17.06.1992 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 17.06.1992 | |
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
DE | 17.06.1992 | ||
ES | 17.06.1992 | ||
IT | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
FR | 06.11.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 17.06.1992 | |
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
DE | 17.06.1992 | ||
IT | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
FR | 06.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/22] | BE | 17.06.1992 | |
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
DE | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
FR | 06.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | BE | 17.06.1992 | |
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
DE | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 17.06.1992 | |
CH | 17.06.1992 | ||
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | CH | 17.06.1992 | |
LI | 17.06.1992 | ||
NL | 17.06.1992 | ||
SE | 17.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | CH | 17.06.1992 | |
LI | 17.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5240541 ; | [A]JP57155278 ; | [A]DE3113998 (SCHLEGEL LINING TECH GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0100579 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]FR2550309 (DILLINGER STAHLBAU [DE]); | [A]CA1232553 (TAKEI NORIO) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 79, 26th July 1977, page 1518 (C-77); & JP-A-52 40 541 (NITTO DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 29-03-1977, & JP5240541 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 261, 21st December 1982, page 127 (C-141)[1139]; & JP-A-57 155 278 (NITTO DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 25-09-1982, & JP57155278 A 00000000 |