EP0338818 - Container, method and composition for controlling the release of a volatile liquid from an aqueous mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Chi-Long 1813 Brookfield Midland Michigan / US | 02 /
Gornowicz, Gerald Alphonse 4613 Bristol Court Midland Michigan / US | 03 /
Larkin, Frank Patrick 5082 Spring Rock Terrace Roswell Georgia / US | 04 /
Mikami, Ryuzo Toray Silicone Company Ltd. Apt. 834 Nishi 1-6 Yusyudai Ichihara City Chiba Prefecture / JP | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89303913.1 | 20.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | US19880184727 | 22.04.1988 Original published format: US 184727 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0338818 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0338818 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338818 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/04 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
A01N25/18 (EP,US);
A61L9/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/43] | Title | German: | Behälter, Verfahren und Anordnung zur Kontrolle der Abgabe einer flüchtigen Flüssigkeit aus einer wässerigen Lösung | [1989/43] | English: | Container, method and composition for controlling the release of a volatile liquid from an aqueous mixture | [1989/43] | French: | Récipient, procédé et composition pour régler le dégagement d'un liquide volatil d'une solution aqueuse | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 23.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0019010 (HYMAN SY) |