EP0338843 - Polyethylene resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.1995 [1995/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Metal Corporation 5-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI METAL CORPORATION No. 5-1, Ohtemachi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sano, Akira 2-276, Kosugi-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yoshizumi, Motohiko Mitsubishi Metal Corporation 1-297, Kitafukuro-cho Omiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Hirata, Hiroki c/o Mitsubishi Metal Corporation 1-297, Kitafukuro-cho Omiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Matsuura, Kazuo 2-22-18, Higashi-Yukigaya Ota-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Suyama, Hisahiko 1809-30, Kamikurata-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1989/43] | Application number, filing date | 89303968.5 | 21.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | JP19880096764 | 21.04.1988 Original published format: JP 9676488 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0338843 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0338843 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338843 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04, C08L23/28 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/04, C08L23/286 (EP,US);
C08L23/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/24 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/43] | Title | German: | Polyäthylen-Zusammensetzung | [1989/43] | English: | Polyethylene resin composition | [1989/43] | French: | Composition de polyéthylène | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3125547 ; | [A]EP0262783 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) |