EP0343786 - Method and apparatus for reading and recording text in digital form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.11.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Yohji 1-1-32 Chuohrinkan Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Casey, Richard G. 975 Easy Street Morgan Hill California 95037 / US | 03 /
Toyokawa, Kazuharu 1 goh 17ban 2-chome Chuohrinkan Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1989/48] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 4-01 S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89304050.1 | 24.04.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | JP19880104469 | 28.04.1988 Original published format: JP 10446988 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343786 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343786 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/68 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
G06V30/242 (EP,US);
G06F18/24323 (EP,US);
G06V30/19173 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Lesen und Speichern von Text in digitaler Form | [1989/48] | English: | Method and apparatus for reading and recording text in digital form | [1989/48] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la lecture et le stockage de texte sous forme numérique | [1989/48] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/02] | 27.08.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP63249282 ; | [AD]US4499596 (CASEY RICHARD G [US], et al) | [AD] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 30, no. 3, August 1987, NEW YORK US pages 1112 - 1114; MANO ET AL.: 'Automatic font selection for character recognition' | [AD] - IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT. vol. 27, no. 4, July 1983, NEW YORK US pages 386 - 399; R.G. CASEY ET AL.: 'A processor-based OCR system' | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 59 (P-826)10 February 1989 & JP-A-63 249 282 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 17 October 1988, & JP63249282 A 19881017 |