EP0339931 - Method and apparatus for recording and reproducing picture information, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | For all designated states PIONEER VIDEO CORPORATION No. 2680, Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | ||
For all designated states PIONEER VIDEO CORPORATION No. 2680, Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshio, Junichi 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-City Saitama / JP | 02 /
Hosaka, Sumio 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-City Saitama / JP | 03 /
Matsuoka, Hisao 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-City Saitama / JP | 04 /
Tsuda, Youichirou 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-City Saitama / JP | 05 /
Katagiri, Shoichi 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-City Saitama / JP | 06 /
Nomura, Satoru No. 2680, Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi / JP | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304105.3 | 25.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | JP19880102180 | 25.04.1988 Original published format: JP 10218088 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339931 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339931 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/92, G11B27/30 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
H04N5/9208 (EP,US);
H04N5/92 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/44] | H04N5/92 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufzeichnen und Wiedergeben von Bildinformation und Aufzeichnungsträger | [1989/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for recording and reproducing picture information, and recording medium | [1989/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'enregistrement et la reproduction d'information image et milieu d'enregistrement | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/29] | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/29] | Request for further processing for: | 29.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.1996 | Decision despatched | 13.01.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 03.02.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP61080690 [ ]; | JP6374167 [ ]; | JP58225784 [ ]; | [A]EP0165320 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4305131 (BEST ROBERT M) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 254 (P-492), 30th August 1986; & jP-A-61 080 690 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 24-04-1986, & JP61080690 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 303 (P-746)[3150], 18th August 1988; & JP-A-63 74 167 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO., LTD) 04-04-1988 (Cat. A), & JP6374167 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 78 (E-237)[1515], 10th April 1984; & JP-A-58 225 784 (SONY K.K.) 27-12-1983, & JP58225784 A 00000000 |