EP0339982 - Antibiotic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Athalye, Medha Beecham Pharmaceuticals Brockham Park Betchworth Surrey RH3 7AJ / GB | 02 /
Coates, Nigel John Beecham Pharmaceuticals Brockham Park Betchworth Surrey RH3 7AJ / GB | 03 /
Milner, Peter Henry Beecham Pharmaceuticals Brockham Park Betchworth Surrey RH3 7AJ / GB | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | West, Vivien, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | West, Vivien, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304174.9 | 26.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | GB19880010050 | 28.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8810050 | GB19880022510 | 26.09.1988 Original published format: GB 8822510 | GB19890003558 | 16.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8903558 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0339982 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07K9/00 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
C07K9/008 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Antibiotika-Verbindungen | [1989/44] | English: | Antibiotic compounds | [1989/44] | French: | Composés antibiotiques | [1989/44] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/05] | 19.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/51] | 16.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0255299 [ ] (SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORP [US]); | EP0265143 [ ] (PFIZER LTD [GB]) |