EP0342815 - Filled polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1989/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schofield, John David Old Oak House 482 Holcombe Road Greenmount Bury Lancashire BL8 4HB / GB | 02 /
Davies, Peter Kingsley 5 Palin Wood Road Delph Oldham Lancashire OL3 5UW / GB | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Beton, John Lonsdale, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Beton, John Lonsdale, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1989/47] | James, David Gomer Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents Po Box 6 Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304412.3 | 02.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | GB19880011947 | 20.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8811947 | [1989/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342815 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342815 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/02, C08L67/06, C08L63/00, C08K5/41, C08K5/42, C08K5/52, C08K5/53, // (C08K5/14, 3:00),(C08K5/52, 3:00) | [1990/51] | CPC: |
C08K5/5333 (EP);
C08K5/41 (EP);
C08K5/42 (EP);
C08K5/521 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/49] | C08K13/02, C08L67/06, C08L63/00, C08K5/41, C08K5/42, C08K5/521, C08K5/5333, // (C08K5/14, 3:00),(C08K5/52, 3:00) | ||
Former IPC [1989/47] | C08K13/02, C08L67/06, C08L63/00, // (C08K5/14, 3:00),(C08K5/52, 3:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Gefüllte Polymerzusammensetzung | [1989/47] | English: | Filled polymer composition | [1989/47] | French: | Composition de polymère chargée | [1989/47] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/30] | 27.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/30] | Request for further processing for: | 12.07.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0233684 [ ]; | [X]EP0232684 ; | [YD]EP0164817 |