EP0341088 - Polymeric couplers prepared in the presence of a coupler solvent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tang, Ping-Wah c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 02 /
Cowan, Stanley Wray c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 03 /
Lau, Philip Thiam Shin c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304602.9 | 08.05.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | US19880190801 | 06.05.1988 Original published format: US 190801 | [1989/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341088 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341088 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341088 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/327 | [1995/15] | CPC: |
G03C7/3275 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/45] | G03C7/32 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1994/48] |
Former [1989/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | In Anwesenheit eines Kupplerlösungsmittels hergestellte Polymerkuppler | [1989/45] | English: | Polymeric couplers prepared in the presence of a coupler solvent | [1989/45] | French: | Coupleurs polymères préparés en présence d'un solvant pour coupleur | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 17.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Request for further processing for: | 04.10.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4612278 ; | [AD]US4080211 |