EP0341994 - System and method with passive resonant circuit markers for locating buried electrical conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cosman, Armond D. Minnesota Mining and Manuf. Co. 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | 02 /
Minarovic, Joe T. Minnesota Mining and Manuf. Co. 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89304710.0 | 10.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | US19880193250 | 11.05.1988 Original published format: US 193250 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341994 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341994 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341994 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/06 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
G01V15/00 (EP,US);
G01V3/10 (KR);
G01V3/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren mit passiven Resonanzschaltungsmarken zur Lokalisierung von eingegrabenen elektrischen Leitungen | [1989/46] | English: | System and method with passive resonant circuit markers for locating buried electrical conductors | [1989/46] | French: | Dispositif et procédé avec marqueurs à circuit de résonance passif pour localiser des conducteurs électriques enterrés | [1989/46] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 13.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60230076 ; | [AD]US4119908 (COSMAN ARMOND D, et al); | [A]EP0247854 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 97 (P-446) 15 April 1986, & JP-A-60 230076 (TOKYO GAS KK) 15 November 1985,, & JP60230076 A 19851115 |