EP0342024 - Luminescent or luminometric assays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KabiVitrum AB 112 87 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states KABIVITRUM AB S-112 87 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blomberg, Fred, Ture Illersstigen 22 S-171 71 Solna / SE | 02 /
Friberg, Jan, Ove Meijerfeldts väg 3 S-183 50 Täby / SE | 03 /
Glindre, Jan-Olof, Valdemar Gränsholmsbacken 16 S-127 42 Skarholmen / SE | 04 /
Kangasmetsä, Jari, Juhani Ostermalmsgatan 84 S-114 50 Stockholm / SE | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304764.7 | 10.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | GB19880011294 | 12.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8811294 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342024 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342024 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, G01N33/542, // G01N33/74 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
C12Q1/28 (EP,US);
G01N33/542 (EP,US);
G01N33/581 (EP,US);
G01N33/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GR [1989/46] | Title | German: | Lumineszierende oder luminometerische Teste | [1989/46] | English: | Luminescent or luminometric assays | [1989/46] | French: | Essais luminescents ou luminométriques | [1989/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 16.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/05] | 03.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0235970 (ERBAMONT INC [US]); | [Y]WO8801746 (NAT RES DEV [GB]); | [YD]EP0116454 (SECR SOCIAL SERVICE BRIT [GB]); | [A]EP0210449 (MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]); | [A]EP0121317 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) |