EP0342043 - Granular laundry compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clayton, Simon Nicholas 70 Tavistock Road West Jesmond Newcastle NE2 3JA / GB | 02 /
Lambert, Peter Mark 1 Upper Green Avenue Scholes Cleckheaton W. Yorkshire BD19 6PD / GB | 03 /
Wevers, Jean Hombeeksesteenweg 526 B-1850 Grimbergen / BE | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1989/46] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas, et al Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304806.6 | 11.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | GB19880011447 | 13.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8811447 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342043 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342043 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342043 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
C11D17/065 (EP,US);
C11D17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Körnige Waschmittelzusammensetzungen | [1989/46] | English: | Granular laundry compositions | [1989/46] | French: | Compositions détergentes granulaires | [1989/46] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.1995
24.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.1995
24.05.1995
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 22.06.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.12.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.10.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.12.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.08.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/40] | Appeal following opposition | 30.01.1998 | Appeal received No. T0114/98 | 21.07.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | Request for further processing for: | 21.01.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0219328 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [A]EP0220024 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]EP0228011 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) |