EP0342888 - Variable geometry turbine inlet wall mounting assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLSET ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED P.O. Box A9 Turnbridge Huddersfield, HD1 6RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states HOLSET ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED P.O. Box A9 Turnbridge Huddersfield, HD1 6RD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mckean, Peter 36 Luck Lane Marsh Huddersfield / GB | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [1989/47] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street Manchester M3 3JY / GB | Application number, filing date | 89304868.6 | 15.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | GB19880011621 | 17.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8811621 | [1989/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0342888 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342888 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/14, F04D29/46 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
F01D17/143 (EP,US);
F05B2230/606 (US);
F05D2230/642 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Montage einer verschiebbaren Wand im Einlass einer Radialturbine | [1989/47] | English: | Variable geometry turbine inlet wall mounting assembly | [1989/47] | French: | Montage d'une paroi déplaçable dans l'entrée d'une turbine radiale | [1989/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1913048 (DRESSER IND); | [A]EP0095853 (HOLSET ENGINEERING CO [GB]) |