EP0351941 - Battery charger with vbe temperature compensation circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHN FLUKE MFG. CO., INC. P.O. Box C9090 6920 Seaway Blvd. Everett Washington 98206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states JOHN FLUKE MFG. CO., INC. P.O. Box C9090 6920 Seaway Blvd. Everett Washington 98206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eng, Benjamin 13215 Highway 99 South Everett Washington 98 204 / US | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305058.3 | 18.05.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | US19880222009 | 21.07.1988 Original published format: US 222009 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351941 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351941 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/10 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
H02J7/007194 (EP,US);
Y10S136/293 (EP,US);
Y10S323/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/04] | Title | German: | Batterielader mit einer Schaltung zur Temperaturkompensation | [1990/04] | English: | Battery charger with vbe temperature compensation circuit | [1990/04] | French: | Chargeur de batterie avec circuit de compensation de température | [1990/04] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 10.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/36] | 12.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3919616 [ ] (ALLISON JOSEPH M); | US4313083 [ ] (GILBERT BARRIE, et al) |