EP0343930 - Data signal processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanota, Keiji Patents Division Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Nagai, Michio Patents Division Sony Corp. 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305208.4 | 23.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | JP19880126606 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: JP 12660688 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343930 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343930 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343930 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B20/14, H04N5/782, H04L25/49 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/1426 (EP,US);
H04N5/92 (EP,US);
H04N5/926 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/48] | G11B20/10, G11B20/14, H04N5/782 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/48] | Title | German: | Verarbeitungsverfahren für Datensignale | [1989/48] | English: | Data signal processing apparatus | [1989/48] | French: | Appareil de traitement de signaux de données | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0104700 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]US4301537 (ROOS JOHN C); | [A]GB2149560 (PHILIPS NV) | Examination | - NTZ 1970, Nr.1, pp. 11-16 |