EP0347049 - Improved primer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | ||
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamis, Russell Peter 5220 Hedgewood Apt. 1009 Midland Michigan / US | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305239.9 | 24.05.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | US19880207480 | 15.06.1988 Original published format: US 207480 | [1989/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0347049 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0347049 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/12, C08L85/00 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
C08J5/12 (EP);
C09D183/14 (EP);
C08J2383/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1989/51] | Title | German: | Haftungsmischung | [1989/51] | English: | Improved primer compositions | [1989/51] | French: | Compositions primaires | [1989/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 27.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/51] | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3671483 ; | [Y]US3388035 ; | [Y]EP0203481 ; | [A]DE1795673 ; | [A]US4499148 |