EP0344968 - Vehicular display view control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE, Inc. 5200 Auto Club Drive Dearborn Michigan 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE, Inc. 5200 Auto Club Drive Dearborn Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutman, Robert F. 21701 Pleasant Street St. Clair Shores Michigan 48080 / US | 02 /
Migrin, Robert 24140 Union Street Dearborn Michigan 48124 / US | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Gilding, Martin John, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305272.0 | 24.05.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | US19880198025 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: US 198025 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344968 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344968 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60K37/02, B60Q3/04 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
B60K37/00 (EP,US);
Y10S359/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | Sichtanzeigesystem für Fahrzeuge | [1989/49] | English: | Vehicular display view control system | [1989/49] | French: | Système de visualisation pour véhicules | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2156292 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]DE3225362 (OPEL ADAM AG); | [A]DE2942730 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]GB1285387 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) |