EP0343980 - System and process for washing granular filter media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/48] | Continuous washed sand filter and washer | ||
[1994/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jacquet, Sten F. Disavagen 8 S-126 58 Hagersten Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states Jacquet, Sten F. Disavagen 8 S-126 58 Hagersten Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | Meddle, Alan Leonard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89305287.8 | 25.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | SE19880001959 | 26.05.1988 Original published format: SE 8801959 | US19890351152 | 12.05.1989 Original published format: US 351152 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0343980 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343980 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D41/02, B01D24/46 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
B01D24/30 (EP);
B01D24/46 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/48] | B01D23/16, B01D23/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Waschen von granularen Filtermedien | [1994/12] | English: | System and process for washing granular filter media | [1994/12] | French: | Disposititf et procédé pour le lavage de matériaux de filtration granulaires | [1994/12] |
Former [1989/48] | Kontinuierlicher gewaschener Sandfilter und Waschanlage | ||
Former [1989/48] | Continuous washed sand filter and washer | ||
Former [1989/48] | Filtre à sable lavé en continu et le dispositif de lavage | Examination procedure | 15.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 23.03.1994 | [2002/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4118313 ; | [X]DE2511497 ; | [YD]US2057887 ; | [A]US1793465 |