EP0347077 - High density board to board interconnection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a Pennsylvania corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, William Robert Route 9, Box 196 Mooresville North Carolina 28115 / US | 02 /
Granitz, Richard Francis 4477 Nantucket Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17112 / US | 03 /
Schmedding, George Robert 4 Oakglade Drive Hummelstown Pennsylvania 17036 / US | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305599.6 | 02.06.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | US19880207411 | 15.06.1988 Original published format: US 207411 | [1989/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347077 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347077 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/68 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
H01R12/7082 (EP,US);
H01R12/00 (US);
H05K1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/51] | Title | German: | Platte an Platte-Zusammenschaltungssystem mit hoher Kontaktdichte | [1989/51] | English: | High density board to board interconnection system | [1989/51] | French: | Système d'interconnexion de plaque à plaque à haute densité de contacts | [1994/43] |
Former [1989/51] | Système d'interconnexion d plaque à plaque à haute densité de contacts | Examination procedure | 08.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 12.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2278222 (SOCAPEX [FR]); | [A]DE3008110 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [A]EP0220677 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [AP]EP0272008 (AMP INC [US]) |