EP0346093 - Fan drive clutch for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNISIA JECS CORPORATION 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states UNISIA JECS CORPORATION 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1993/33] | For all designated states ATSUGI UNISIA CORPORATION 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states ATSUGI MOTOR PARTS CO. LTD. 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harima, Toshio Atsugi Motor Parts Comp. Ltd. 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Kenichi Atsugi Motor Parts Comp. Ltd. 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Matsuya, Tatsuyuki Atsugi Motor Parts Comp. 1370, Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305737.2 | 07.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | JP19880075688 | 07.06.1988 Original published format: JP 7568888 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0346093 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0346093 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346093 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16D35/00 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
F16D35/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/50] | Title | German: | Lüfterkupplung für Verbrennungsmotor | [1989/50] | English: | Fan drive clutch for internal combustion engine | [1989/50] | French: | Embrayage pour ventilateur d'un moteur à combustion interne | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 03.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0045037 (EATON CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0130024 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]EP0130724 (EATON CORP [US]) |