EP0349155 - Process for producing crosslinked polyolefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, INCORPORATED 2-5, 3-chome, Kasumigaseki Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asanuma, Tadashi 4-1-133, Toriishi 3-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Kazuhiko 9-6-648, Nishitoriishi 3-chome Takaishi-shi Osaka / JP | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306023.6 | 14.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | JP19880146527 | 14.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14652788 | JP19890107488 | 28.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10748889 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349155 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349155 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349155 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/02, C08L43/04 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
C08J3/28 (EP,US);
B29C71/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L43/04 (EP,US);
B29C2035/085 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0877 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/10] | C08L23/02, C08J7/10, C08L43/04 | ||
Former IPC [1990/01] | C08L43/04, C08L23/02, B29C71/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung vernetzter Polyolefine | [1990/01] | English: | Process for producing crosslinked polyolefins | [1990/01] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de polyoléfines réticulées | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63088707 ; | [XE]EP0361744 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]FR2558472 (CONSERVATOME [FR]) | [X] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 8821, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 88-145239 & JP-A-63 088 707 (HITACHI CABLE) 19 April 1988, & JP63088707 A 19880419 |